|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 678, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 6529.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 4909.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Evans.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 16. Page 2366.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Evans. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2366.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 1474.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|