California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB929 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 23, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012
Bill August 31, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011