LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB929
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB929
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB929
Compare Versions
AB929 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB929 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB929 Amended August 23, 2012
AB929 Amended April 9, 2012
AB929 Amended August 31, 2011
AB929 Amended March 31, 2011
AB929 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB929 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB929 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB929 Amended August 23, 2012
AB929 Amended April 9, 2012
AB929 Amended August 31, 2011
AB929 Amended March 31, 2011
AB929 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare