|
09/04/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2012
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6117.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4586.)
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 1. Page 4485.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|