California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR100 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 4, 2012

Amended

Bill August 14, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012
Bill June 4, 2012
Bill May 14, 2012
Bill March 27, 2012