LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR100
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR100
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR100
Compare Versions
ACR100 Chaptered September 4, 2012
ACR100 Enrolled August 27, 2012
ACR100 Amended August 14, 2012
ACR100 Amended August 6, 2012
ACR100 Amended June 26, 2012
ACR100 Amended June 4, 2012
ACR100 Amended May 14, 2012
ACR100 Amended March 27, 2012
ACR100 Introduced February 6, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
ACR100 Chaptered September 4, 2012
ACR100 Enrolled August 27, 2012
ACR100 Amended August 14, 2012
ACR100 Amended August 6, 2012
ACR100 Amended June 26, 2012
ACR100 Amended June 4, 2012
ACR100 Amended May 14, 2012
ACR100 Amended March 27, 2012
ACR100 Introduced February 6, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare