|
09/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 506, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 4687.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 6071.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3741.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 21. Noes 9. Page 3716.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Yee. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3716.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3564.) (May 21).
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3232.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|