LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1001
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1001
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1001
Compare Versions
SB1001 Chaptered September 24, 2012
SB1001 Enrolled August 23, 2012
SB1001 Amended June 21, 2012
SB1001 Amended May 17, 2012
SB1001 Amended May 8, 2012
SB1001 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1001 Introduced February 6, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1001 Chaptered September 24, 2012
SB1001 Enrolled August 23, 2012
SB1001 Amended June 21, 2012
SB1001 Amended May 17, 2012
SB1001 Amended May 8, 2012
SB1001 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1001 Introduced February 6, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare