California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1001 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2012

Amended

Bill June 21, 2012
Bill May 17, 2012
Bill May 8, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012