|
09/28/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 3. Page 5116.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 6784.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3738.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3589.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3207.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|