California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1002 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill June 21, 2012
Bill May 29, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012
Bill March 12, 2012