LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1002
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1002
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1002
Compare Versions
SB1002 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB1002 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1002 Amended June 21, 2012
SB1002 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1002 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1002 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1002 Amended March 12, 2012
SB1002 Introduced February 6, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1002 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB1002 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1002 Amended June 21, 2012
SB1002 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1002 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1002 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1002 Amended March 12, 2012
SB1002 Introduced February 6, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare