California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1044 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2012

Amended

Bill March 19, 2012
Bill March 8, 2012