LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1044
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1044
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1044
Compare Versions
SB1044 Chaptered August 29, 2012
SB1044 Enrolled August 16, 2012
SB1044 Amended March 19, 2012
SB1044 Amended March 8, 2012
SB1044 Introduced February 6, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1044 Chaptered August 29, 2012
SB1044 Enrolled August 16, 2012
SB1044 Amended March 19, 2012
SB1044 Amended March 8, 2012
SB1044 Introduced February 6, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare