California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1044 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/29/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1044CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 219 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 29, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 29, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE MAY 10, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 19, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 8, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Liu FEBRUARY 6, 2012 An act to amend Sections 18720, 18725, and 18747 of, to repeal Sections 18741, 18742, 18749, and 18750 of, and to repeal Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 18800) of Part 11 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, the Education Code, relating to libraries. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1044, Liu. Libraries: administration. (1) The California Library Services Act establishes the California Library Services Board and provides that its duties include, among other things, adopting rules, regulations, and general policies relating to the implementation of the act. Under the act, a library system, constituted as specified, receives an annual allowance for the improvement and maintenance of coordinated reference service support to the members of the system. The act authorizes a library system to apply for funds for special services programs, as defined. The act requires a library system to apply for funds for intrasystem communications and delivery and for planning, coordination, and evaluation of overall systemwide services. The act also requires each system to establish an administrative council and an advisory board, each with specified duties. This bill would delete the annual allowance for the improvement and maintenance of coordinated reference service support to the members of a library system. The bill would also delete the authorization for a library system to apply for funds for special services programs. The bill would delete the requirement that a library system establish a specified advisory board. The bill would make conforming changes. (2) The Library of California Act augments the services provided under the California Library Services Act and establishes regional library networks composed of libraries that agree to share services and resources with one another. The Library of California Act establishes the Library of California Board, and provides that the initial members of the board shall be those persons serving on the California Library Services Board at the time of the enactment of the Library of California Act. Existing law provides for a transition period from the California Library Services Act services and funding to the Library of California Act services and funding, and repeals the California Library Services Act upon completion of the transition. This bill would repeal the Library of California Act. The bill would require that, on January 1, 2013, the members of the California Library Services Board be those persons serving on the Library of California Board, who shall serve for the duration of their terms. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18720 of the Education Code is amended to read: 18720. (a) There is hereby established in the state government the California Library Services Board, to consist of 13 members. The Governor shall appoint nine members of the board. Three of the Governor's appointments shall be representative of laypersons, one of whom shall represent people with disabilities, one of whom shall represent limited- and non-English-speaking persons, and one of whom shall represent economically disadvantaged persons. (b) The Governor shall also appoint six members of the board, each of whom shall represent one of the following categories: school libraries, libraries for institutionalized persons, public library trustees or commissioners, public libraries, special libraries, and academic libraries. (c) The Legislature shall appoint the remaining four public members from persons who are not representative of categories mentioned in this section. Two shall be appointed by the Senate Rules Committee and two shall be appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly. (d) The terms of office of members of the board shall be for four years and shall begin on January 1 of the year in which the respective terms are to start. (e) On January 1, 2013, the members of the board shall be those persons serving on the former Library of California Board, appointed pursuant to former Section 18820, as it existed on December 31, 2012, who shall serve for the duration of their terms. SEC. 2. Section 18725 of the Education Code is amended to read: 18725. The state board shall serve as the State Advisory Council on Libraries for the purpose of meeting the requirements of the federal Library Services and Technology Act. SEC. 3. Section 18741 of the Education Code is repealed. SEC. 4. Section 18742 of the Education Code is repealed. SEC. 5. Section 18747 of the Education Code is amended to read: 18747. Each system shall establish an administrative council whose membership consists of the head librarians of each jurisdiction in the system. Duties of the administrative council shall include general administrative responsibility for the system, adopting a system plan of service, and submitting annual proposals to the state board for implementation of the provisions of this article. SEC. 6. Section 18749 of the Education Code is repealed. SEC. 7. Section 18750 of the Education Code is repealed. SEC. 8. Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 18800) of Part 11 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code is repealed.