|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 660, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4767.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6137.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6002.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5340.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 5340.)
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3665.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3446.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3308.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|