California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1051 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 18, 2012
Bill May 10, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012
Bill March 28, 2012