LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1051
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1051
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1051
Compare Versions
SB1051 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB1051 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB1051 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1051 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1051 Amended June 18, 2012
SB1051 Amended May 10, 2012
SB1051 Amended April 17, 2012
SB1051 Amended March 28, 2012
SB1051 Introduced February 8, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1051 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB1051 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB1051 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1051 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1051 Amended June 18, 2012
SB1051 Amended May 10, 2012
SB1051 Amended April 17, 2012
SB1051 Amended March 28, 2012
SB1051 Introduced February 8, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare