05/31/2012 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 15. Page 3749.) | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 18. Page 3717.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pavley. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3717.) | |||
05/29/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3589.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/14/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/08/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/04/2012 | Set for hearing May 14. | |||
05/01/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3261.) (April 23). | |||
04/17/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Set for hearing April 23. | |||
04/16/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3121.) (April 10). | |||
03/29/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
03/23/2012 | Set for hearing April 10. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. | |||
02/10/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |||
02/09/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |