California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1054 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2012

Amended

Bill May 29, 2012
Bill May 8, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012