LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1054
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1054
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1054
Compare Versions
SB1054 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1054 Amended May 8, 2012
SB1054 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1054 Amended April 17, 2012
SB1054 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1054 Introduced February 9, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1054 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1054 Amended May 8, 2012
SB1054 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1054 Amended April 17, 2012
SB1054 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1054 Introduced February 9, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare