|
09/14/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 329, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4962.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 9. Page 6343.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6168.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3738.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3590.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3314.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3189.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2012
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|