BILL NUMBER: SB 1076CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 329 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 14, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 14, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 29, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 27, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 19, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 29, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 19, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Emmerson FEBRUARY 14, 2012 An act to add and repeal Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 39945) of Part 2 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1076, Emmerson. California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: tire inflation regulation. The California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 designates the State Air Resources Board as the state agency charged with monitoring and regulating sources of emissions of greenhouse gases. The state board is required to adopt a statewide greenhouse gas emissions limit equivalent to the statewide greenhouse gas emissions level in 1990 to be achieved by 2020, and to adopt rules and regulations in an open public process to achieve the maximum technologically feasible and cost-effective greenhouse gas emission reductions. A violation of a regulation adopted by the state board pursuant to the act is subject to specified civil and criminal penalties. Pursuant to the act, the state board adopted a regulation requiring automobile service providers, by September 1, 2010, among other things, to check and inflate vehicle tires to the recommended pressure rating when performing automobile maintenance or repair services. This bill, until January 1, 2018, would require a tire pressure gauge used to meet the requirements of this regulation to be accurate within a range of plus or minus 2 pounds per square inch of pressure (2 psi). The bill, until January 1, 2018, would authorize automotive service providers to meet the requirements of the regulation without checking and inflating a vehicle's tire if that tire is determined to be an unsafe tire, as defined. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 39945) is added to Part 2 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, to read: CHAPTER 9. TIRE PRESSURE 39945. (a) For purposes of this chapter, "unsafe tire" means any tire considered unsafe in accordance with standard industry practices due to tire tread wear, tread irregularity, or damage. Examples include any tire with an exposed ply or cord, a sidewall crack, a bulge, a knot, or a ply separation. (b) For purposes of a regulation adopted pursuant to Division 25.5 (commencing with Section 38500) that requires an automotive service provider to check and inflate a vehicle's tires while performing automotive maintenance or repair service, a tire pressure gauge used by the provider to inflate a tire pursuant to that regulation shall be accurate within a range of plus or minus two pounds per square inch of pressure (2 psi). (c) An automotive service provider shall not be required to check and inflate a vehicle's tire pursuant to subdivision (b) if that tire is determined to be an unsafe tire. (d) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, deletes or extends that date.