LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1076
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1076
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1076
Compare Versions
SB1076 Chaptered September 14, 2012
SB1076 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1076 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1076 Amended June 19, 2012
SB1076 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1076 Amended March 19, 2012
SB1076 Introduced February 14, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1076 Chaptered September 14, 2012
SB1076 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1076 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1076 Amended June 19, 2012
SB1076 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1076 Amended March 19, 2012
SB1076 Introduced February 14, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare