|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 652, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5018.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6569.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6090.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3553.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3306.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3033.) (March 28).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|