LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1087
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1087
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1087
Compare Versions
SB1087 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB1087 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1087 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1087 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1087 Amended June 7, 2012
SB1087 Amended April 30, 2012
SB1087 Amended April 10, 2012
SB1087 Introduced February 15, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1087 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB1087 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1087 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1087 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1087 Amended June 7, 2012
SB1087 Amended April 30, 2012
SB1087 Amended April 10, 2012
SB1087 Introduced February 15, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare