California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1087 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 7, 2012
Bill April 30, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012