|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 705, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5026.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6195.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3743.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3590.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 18.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3304.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3121.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|