LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1094
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1094
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1094
Compare Versions
SB1094 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB1094 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1094 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1094 Amended June 19, 2012
SB1094 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1094 Amended May 15, 2012
SB1094 Amended April 19, 2012
SB1094 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1094 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1094 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1094 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB1094 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1094 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1094 Amended June 19, 2012
SB1094 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1094 Amended May 15, 2012
SB1094 Amended April 19, 2012
SB1094 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1094 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1094 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare