California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1094 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill May 29, 2012
Bill May 15, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012