|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 12. Page 6334.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6086.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5942.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 2717.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2685.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 359.) (March 16).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|