LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB114
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB114
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB114
Compare Versions
SB114 Chaptered September 30, 2012
SB114 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB114 Amended August 22, 2012
SB114 Amended August 16, 2012
SB114 Amended June 20, 2012
SB114 Amended May 14, 2012
SB114 Amended January 17, 2012
SB114 Amended May 31, 2011
SB114 Amended April 4, 2011
SB114 Amended March 23, 2011
SB114 Amended March 10, 2011
SB114 Introduced January 19, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB114 Chaptered September 30, 2012
SB114 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB114 Amended August 22, 2012
SB114 Amended August 16, 2012
SB114 Amended June 20, 2012
SB114 Amended May 14, 2012
SB114 Amended January 17, 2012
SB114 Amended May 31, 2011
SB114 Amended April 4, 2011
SB114 Amended March 23, 2011
SB114 Amended March 10, 2011
SB114 Introduced January 19, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare