California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB114 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill August 16, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill May 14, 2012
Bill January 17, 2012
Bill May 31, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011
Bill March 23, 2011
Bill March 10, 2011