California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB114 Amended / Bill

Filed 01/17/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 114AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 17, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 4, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 23, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 10, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee JANUARY 19, 2011 An act to add Section 87483.7 to the Education Code, relating to community colleges. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 114, as amended, Yee. Community colleges: academic salary schedules. Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law establishes community college districts, administered by district governing boards, throughout the state, and authorizes  these   community college  districts to employ faculty members to provide instruction to students at the community college campuses maintained by the  community college  districts.  Existing law also authorizes the governing board of a   community college district to employ both full-time and part-time employees and establish regulations allowing academic employees to reduce their workload from full-time to part-time duties, as specified.   Existing law requires community college districts with less than 75% of their hours of credit instruction taught by full-time instructors to apply a portion of their program improvement allocation, as provided, to reaching the 75% standard.   This bill would authorize community college districts to present the compensation of part-time community college faculty using a salary schedule that compares part-time faculty salaries to salaries of full-time faculty with similar academic preparation and years of experience. The bill would authorize part-time faculty to be placed on a salary schedule that mirrors the same relationship to the placement of full-time faculty on the schedule. The   This  bill would authorize a community college district to calculate the salary of a part-time faculty member and report it, as specified. The bill would also prohibit its provisions from affecting the implementation of specified collective bargaining agreements  ,  and would authorize its provisions to be subjects of negotiation for new or successor collective bargaining agreements. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 87483.7 is added to the Education Code, to read:  87483.7. (a) A community college district may present the compensation of part-time community college faculty using a salary schedule that compares part-time faculty salaries to salaries of full-time faculty with similar academic preparation and years of experience. Part-time faculty may be placed on a salary schedule that mirrors the same relationship to placement of full-time faculty on the schedule. (b)   87483.7.   (a)  A community college district may calculate the salary of a part-time faculty member, and report that salary on payroll notices and to the State Teachers' Retirement System, as a percentage of salary for a full-time teaching load.  (c)   (b)  (1) This section shall not preclude the implementation of any agreement entered into pursuant to Chapter 10.7 (commencing with Section 3540) of Division 4 of Title 1 of the Government Code that is in effect before January 1, 2012. To the extent that such an agreement conflicts with this section, the agreement shall prevail. (2) The provisions of this section may be subjects of negotiation with respect to the collective bargaining process relating to any new or successor agreement entered into between a community college district and part-time faculty occurring on or after January 1, 2012.