|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 867, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4763.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6148.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3645.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|