LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1144
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1144
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1144
Compare Versions
SB1144 Chaptered September 30, 2012
SB1144 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB1144 Amended August 16, 2012
SB1144 Amended June 20, 2012
SB1144 Amended June 14, 2012
SB1144 Amended May 21, 2012
SB1144 Amended April 18, 2012
SB1144 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1144 Chaptered September 30, 2012
SB1144 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB1144 Amended August 16, 2012
SB1144 Amended June 20, 2012
SB1144 Amended June 14, 2012
SB1144 Amended May 21, 2012
SB1144 Amended April 18, 2012
SB1144 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare