California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1144 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill June 14, 2012
Bill May 21, 2012
Bill April 18, 2012