|
09/10/2011
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2487.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 1324.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 2472.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1985.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Set for hearing August 15.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.1 that the measure be re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1838.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Set for hearing July 13.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1790.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 846.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 430.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|