LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB116
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB116
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB116
Compare Versions
SB116 Amended September 9, 2011
SB116 Amended September 2, 2011
SB116 Amended August 29, 2011
SB116 Amended August 18, 2011
SB116 Amended July 7, 2011
SB116 Amended February 23, 2011
SB116 Introduced January 19, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB116 Amended September 9, 2011
SB116 Amended September 2, 2011
SB116 Amended August 29, 2011
SB116 Amended August 18, 2011
SB116 Amended July 7, 2011
SB116 Amended February 23, 2011
SB116 Introduced January 19, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare