California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB116 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2011

Amended

Bill September 9, 2011
Bill September 2, 2011
Bill August 29, 2011
Bill August 18, 2011
Bill July 7, 2011
Bill February 23, 2011