|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 488, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4624.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5965.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2700.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 2623.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4. Page 737.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|