LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB118
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB118
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB118
Compare Versions
SB118 Chaptered September 23, 2012
SB118 Enrolled August 22, 2012
SB118 Amended August 6, 2012
SB118 Amended April 26, 2012
SB118 Amended January 12, 2012
SB118 Amended January 4, 2012
SB118 Amended April 28, 2011
SB118 Introduced January 20, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB118 Chaptered September 23, 2012
SB118 Enrolled August 22, 2012
SB118 Amended August 6, 2012
SB118 Amended April 26, 2012
SB118 Amended January 12, 2012
SB118 Amended January 4, 2012
SB118 Amended April 28, 2011
SB118 Introduced January 20, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare