California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB118 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012
Bill January 12, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill April 28, 2011