|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 727, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5080.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Set for hearing August 30. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5043.)
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4923.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6355.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6171.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5900.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5594.) Set, second hearing. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. suspense file. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2678.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2623.) (January 10).
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|