California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB12 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 23, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill August 13, 2012
Bill August 7, 2012
Bill June 25, 2012
Bill May 3, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012