LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB12
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB12
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB12
Compare Versions
SB12 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB12 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB12 Amended August 23, 2012
SB12 Amended August 21, 2012
SB12 Amended August 13, 2012
SB12 Amended August 7, 2012
SB12 Amended June 25, 2012
SB12 Amended May 3, 2012
SB12 Amended January 4, 2012
SB12 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB12 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB12 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB12 Amended August 23, 2012
SB12 Amended August 21, 2012
SB12 Amended August 13, 2012
SB12 Amended August 7, 2012
SB12 Amended June 25, 2012
SB12 Amended May 3, 2012
SB12 Amended January 4, 2012
SB12 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare