|
09/22/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 455, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4626.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5969.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3487.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3260.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3143.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|