California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1301 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 21, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012