LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1301
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1301
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1301
Compare Versions
SB1301 Chaptered September 22, 2012
SB1301 Enrolled August 22, 2012
SB1301 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1301 Amended June 21, 2012
SB1301 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1301 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1301 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1301 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1301 Chaptered September 22, 2012
SB1301 Enrolled August 22, 2012
SB1301 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1301 Amended June 21, 2012
SB1301 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1301 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1301 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1301 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare