|
07/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 7.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 5419.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 3493.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3390.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|